Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | ASHOK KUMAR GOYAL | Executive Director,Chairperson related to Promoter | 04 Dec 2001 | 01 Sep 2019 | - | - | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | SATISH KUMAR GOYAL | Executive Director | 04 Dec 2001 | 01 Sep 2019 | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | OM PRAKASH AGARWAL | Executive Director,CEO-MD | 04 Dec 2001 | 01 Aug 2017 | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | AMOL DONERIA | Non-Executive - Independent Director,Employee Director | 01 Jul 2014 | 23 Sep 2019 | - | 60 | 1 | 2 | 2 |
Mr | RAJESH KUMAR GUPTA | Non-Executive - Independent Director,Employee Director | 01 Jul 2014 | 23 Sep 2019 | - | 60 | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mrs | ASTHA SHARMA | Non-Executive - Independent Director,Employee Director | 01 Jul 2014 | 23 Sep 2019 | - | 60 | 1 | 2 | 0 |