Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | MOOSA RAZA | Non-Executive - Independent Director,Chairperson | 23 Sep 2014 | 01 Apr 2019 | - | 63 | 1 | 0 | 2 |
Mr | ARJAN GURBUXANI | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 23 Sep 2014 | 01 Apr 2019 | - | 63 | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | KUNAL SAGAR | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 25 Sep 2015 | 03 Sep 2019 | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | RAHUL SAGAR | Executive Director,CEO-MD | 01 Feb 2016 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | KUNNASAGARAN CHINNIAH | Non-Executive - Nominee Director | 28 Apr 2016 | 26 Sep 2018 | - | - | 2 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | RAJINDER PAL SINGH | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 13 May 2019 | 03 Sep 2019 | - | 8 | 3 | 4 | 0 |
Ms | ANJALI SETH | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 13 May 2019 | 03 Sep 2019 | - | 8 | 7 | 4 | 2 |