Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | DAYAKRISHNA GOYAL | Executive Director,Chairperson,MD | 01 Apr 1995 | 29 Jul 2017 | - | 60 | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | HANSRAJ GOYAL | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 27 Jul 2009 | 30 Sep 2019 | - | 60 | 1 | 1 | 1 |
Mr | DINESH VIJAYVARGIA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 24 Mar 2003 | 30 Sep 2019 | - | 60 | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mrs | PRATIBHA GOYAL | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 08 Aug 2014 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 1 |
Mr | KIRAN VAIDYA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 16 Jan 2018 | - | - | 24 | 3 | 0 | 2 |
Mr | SUKHDEO AGRAWAL | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 16 Jan 2018 | - | - | 24 | 1 | 0 | 0 |