Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | Kiran B Vadodaria | Executive Director,Chairperson related to Promoter,CEO-MD | 26 Jul 1990 | 01 Jun 2018 | - | - | 2 | 3 | 1 |
Mr | Amit Kumar Ray | Executive Director | 09 Feb 2013 | 12 Feb 2019 | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | Manoj B Vadodaria | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 18 Jul 1995 | - | - | - | 2 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | N R Mehta | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 01 Apr 2003 | 29 Sep 2014 | - | 60 | 1 | 2 | 2 |
Mr | Dilip D Patel | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 01 Jun 2000 | 29 Sep 2014 | - | 60 | 2 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | O P Bhandari | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 01 Aug 2003 | 29 Sep 2014 | - | 60 | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mrs | Gouri P Popat | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 12 Feb 2019 | - | - | 12 | 1 | 0 | 0 |