Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | Y. RAMESH | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 01 Sep 2016 | - | - | 60 | 3 | 6 | 2 |
Mr | DASI EMMANUEL | Executive Director | 14 Nov 2014 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | OMESHKUMAR WAGHRAY | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 01 Sep 2016 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 3 | 0 |
Mr | R.VIVEK KUMAR | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 11 Aug 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 3 | 3 |
Mr | P.PARTHA SARTHI | Executive Director | 27 May 2016 | - | - | - | 4 | 9 | 5 |
Mr | D.V.S.S.LAKSHMINARAYANA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 11 Aug 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | VENKATA SRINIVAS MEENAVALLI | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director,Chairperson | 02 Nov 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | AVILASH DELHIWALA | Executive Director | 05 Aug 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mrs | M V LAXMI | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 31 Mar 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | AVINASH KARINGAM | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 28 Sep 2015 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 3 | 1 |