Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | AMIT KUMAR RAY | Executive Director | 09 Feb 2013 | - | - | - | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | DILIP D PATEL | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 20 Sep 2014 | - | - | 60 | 2 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | KIRAN B VADODARIA | Executive Director,Chairperson,MD | 09 Feb 2013 | - | - | - | 2 | 3 | 1 |
Mr | MANOJ B VADODARIA | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director,Shareholder Director | 18 Jul 1995 | - | - | - | 2 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | NAVINCHANDRA R MEHTA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 20 Sep 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 0 | 2 |
Mr | OM PRAKASH BHANDARI | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 20 Sep 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Ms | SEEMA G SAXENA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 15 Sep 2016 | - | - | 12 | 1 | 0 | 0 |