Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | Venkata Srinivas Meenavalli | Chairperson,Promoter Director | 02 Nov 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | D.Emmanuel | Executive Director | 22 Jul 2011 | - | - | 36 | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | D.V.S.S.Lakshmlnaray ana | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 19 Jan 2008 | - | - | - | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | Avilash Delhiwala | Executive Director | 05 Aug 2015 | - | - | 36 | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | R.Vivek Kumar | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 15 Nov 2012 | - | - | - | 1 | 3 | 3 |
Mr | P.Partha Sarthi | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 14 Aug 2014 | - | - | - | 4 | 9 | 5 |
Mr | Dr. Avinash Karingam | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 25 Mar 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 3 | 0 |
Mrs | M.V. Laxmi | Non - Executive Director | 31 Mar 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |