Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | Bahubali Shantilal Shah | Chairperson,Executive Director | 01 Nov 1994 | - | - | - | 3 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | Amam Shreyans Shah | Executive Director,CEO | 25 Oct 1994 | - | - | - | 3 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | Himanshu Jayantilal Kamdar | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 27 Sep 1995 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 1 |
Mr | Ashok Chunilal Damani | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 31 Mar 2002 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | Bharatbhai Kasturbhai Shah | Non - Executive Director,Independent Director | 31 Jul 2003 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 0 |