Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | DASI EMMANUEL | Executive Director,Chairperson | 22 Jul 2011 | 14 Nov 2014 | - | - | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | SUDHEER VEGI | Executive Director | 14 Feb 2018 | 28 Sep 2018 | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | SIVA SATYA SRINIVAS CHUKKA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 30 Apr 2019 | 30 Apr 2019 | - | 60 | 2 | 6 | 0 |
Mr | VENKATA KRISHNAYYA NEKKANTI | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 08 Aug 2019 | 08 Aug 2019 | - | 60 | 2 | 6 | 0 |
Mr | AVINASH KARINGAM | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 22 Jul 2011 | 29 Sep 2011 | - | 60 | 2 | 3 | 3 |
Mrs | CHUKKA LAKSHMI | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 20 Mar 2017 | 29 Sep 2017 | - | 60 | 3 | 8 | 0 |