Disclosure of notes on composition of committees explanatory | - |
Audit Committee Details |
Whether the Audit Committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 01010363 | Dakshendra Brijballabh Agrawal | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Chairperson | 10-01-2020 | - | - |
2 | 01725158 | Vinod Agarwala | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
3 | 06411532 | Sushil Kumar Mishra | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 02-07-2020 | - | - |
4 | 01249904 | Vikram Bhawanishankar Sharma | Executive Director | Member | 30-12-2020 | - | - |
5 | 00015784 | Vishwanath Prasad Singh | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
Nomination and remuneration committee |
Whether the Nomination and remuneration committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 01725158 | Vinod Agarwala | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Chairperson | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
2 | 01010363 | Dakshendra Brijballabh Agrawal | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
3 | 06411532 | Sushil Kumar Mishra | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 02-07-2020 | - | - |
Stakeholders Relationship Committee |
Whether the Stakeholders Relationship Committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 01725158 | Vinod Agarwala | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Chairperson | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
2 | 01249904 | Vikram Bhawanishankar Sharma | Executive Director | Member | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
3 | 01010363 | Dakshendra Brijballabh Agrawal | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 10-01-2020 | - | - |
Corporate Social Responsibility Committee |
Whether the Corporate Social Responsibility Committee has a Regular Chairperson | NO |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 01249904 | Vikram Bhawanishankar Sharma | Executive Director | Chairperson | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
2 | 01725158 | Vinod Agarwala | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 30-12-2019 | - | - |
3 | 01010363 | Dakshendra Brijballabh Agrawal | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 10-01-2020 | - | - |