Disclosure of notes on composition of committees explanatory | - |
Audit Committee Details |
Whether the Audit Committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 02106990 | MELEVEETIL DAMODARAN | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Chairperson | 04-03-2019 | - | - |
2 | 03421015 | ANUPAM KHANNA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 27-03-2015 | - | - |
3 | 00055377 | ANIL PARASHAR | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Member | 24-10-2018 | - | - |
Nomination and remuneration committee |
Whether the Nomination and remuneration committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 03421015 | ANUPAM KHANNA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Chairperson | 27-03-2015 | - | - |
2 | 02106990 | MELEVEETIL DAMODARAN | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 29-03-2019 | - | - |
3 | 00055377 | ANIL PARASHAR | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Member | 06-11-2018 | - | - |
Stakeholders Relationship Committee |
Whether the Stakeholders Relationship Committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 01583219 | ROHINI BHATIA | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Chairperson | 27-03-2015 | - | - |
2 | 03421015 | ANUPAM KHANNA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 27-04-2018 | - | - |
3 | 00055377 | ANIL PARASHAR | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Member | 24-10-2018 | - | - |
Risk Management Committee |
Whether the Risk Management Committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 03421015 | ANUPAM KHANNA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Chairperson | 27-04-2018 | - | - |
2 | 00055377 | ANIL PARASHAR | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Member | 24-10-2018 | - | - |
3 | 99999999 | RONO JOY DUTTA | Member | Member | 04-03-2019 | - | - |
Corporate Social Responsibility Committee |
Whether the Corporate Social Responsibility Committee has a Regular Chairperson | YES |
Sr | DIN Number | Name of Committee members | Category 1 of directors | Category 2 of directors | Date Of Appointment | Date of Cessation | Remarks |
1 | 01583219 | ROHINI BHATIA | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Chairperson | 27-03-2015 | - | - |
2 | 03421015 | ANUPAM KHANNA | Non-Executive - Independent Director | Member | 27-03-2015 | - | - |
3 | 00055377 | ANIL PARASHAR | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | Member | 23-01-2019 | - | - |