Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | A. SURYA PRAKASH REDDY | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 05 Jul 2016 | - | - | 60 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | BHARATHAN RAJAGOPALAN THATAI | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 26 Nov 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | DILIP MANGESH KALELKAR | Executive Director | 01 May 2014 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | GOTTEMUKKALA VENKATAPATHI RAJU | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 26 Nov 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 3 | 0 |
Mr | PAI ABHIJEET | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | - | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | PERAJE ANANTH PAI | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 29 Oct 2008 | - | - | - | 1 | 4 | 0 |
Mr | PERAJE PRAKASH PAI | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director,Chairperson | 29 Oct 2008 | - | - | - | 1 | 4 | 1 |
Mr | RABINDRANATH JARUGUMILLI | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 26 Nov 2014 | - | - | 60 | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | SUBRAMANYA RAM GANAPATH | Executive Director | 04 Nov 2013 | - | - | - | 1 | 4 | 0 |
Mrs | ASHWINI PAI | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 05 Nov 2008 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |