Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | Harish Laddha | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 26 Sep 2014 | - | 30 Oct 2015 | 13 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | KAMLESH HIRAPARA | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 15 May 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 1 |
Mr | RAJIV KOTIA | Executive Director,Chairperson,CEO-MD | 01 Jul 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Mr | RAKESH KUMAR KUMAWAT | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 12 Feb 2016 | - | - | - | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | Sharad Gandhi | Non-Executive - Non Independent Director | 26 Sep 2014 | - | 30 Oct 2015 | - | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | Uma Maheshwara Rao Sikhinam | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 26 Sep 2014 | - | - | 18 | 1 | 1 | 0 |
Ms | Anoma Contractor | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 26 Sep 2014 | - | 30 Oct 2015 | 13 | 0 | 0 | 0 |
Ms | KARISHMA KAKU | Non-Executive - Independent Director | 29 Sep 2015 | - | - | 6 | 1 | 1 | 1 |