Title | Name of the Director | Category | Initial Date of Appointment | Date of Appointment in Current Term (Date of Re-appointment) | Date of cessation | Tenure of Director (in months) | No of Directorship in listed entities including this listed entity | Number of memberships in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee(s) including this listed entity | No of post of Chairperson in Audit/ Stakeholder Committee held in listed entities including this listed entity |
Mr | Arjan R. Gurbuxani | Independent Director,Non - Executive Director | 23 Sep 2014 | - | 31 Mar 2019 | 60 | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mr | KUNAL V SAGAR | Promoter Director,Non - Executive Director | 25 Sep 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | Moosa Raza | Independent Director,Chairperson,Non - Executive Director | 23 Sep 2014 | - | 31 Mar 2019 | 60 | 1 | 2 | 2 |
Mr | RAHUL V SAGAR | Promoter Director,Whole Time Director | 01 Apr 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |
Mr | Rama Varma | Independent Director,Non - Executive Director | 23 Sep 2014 | - | 31 Mar 2019 | 60 | 1 | 2 | 0 |
Mrs | Aruna Makhan | Independent Director,Non - Executive Director | 23 Sep 2014 | - | 31 Mar 2019 | 60 | 2 | 4 | 0 |
Mrs | RAJANI M. BHAGAT | Promoter Director,Non - Executive Director | 21 Sep 2015 | - | - | - | 1 | 0 | 0 |